TX HR1224 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 4, 2017, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 4, 2017, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PORT ARANSAS DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates