TX HR1203 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing September 2019 as Atrial Fibrillation Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing September 2019 as Atrial Fibrillation Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1359 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1359 |
2019-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATRIAL FIBRILLATION AWARENESS MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates