TX HR1188 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 25, 2019, as Vietnamese American Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 25, 2019, as Vietnamese American Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] |
Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-25 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
VIETNAMESE AMERICAN DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
VIETNAMESE AMERICAN DAY