TX HR1179 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 18, 2019, as Texas Easterseals Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 18, 2019, as Texas Easterseals Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EASTERSEALS DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates