TX HR116 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 20, 2019, as Lufkin and Angelina County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 20, 2019, as Lufkin and Angelina County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LUFKIN & ANGELINA COUNTY DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates