TX HR116 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the founding of the Kilgore College Rangerettes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the founding of the Kilgore College Rangerettes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25HouseReported enrolled
2015-02-19HouseAdopted
2015-02-19HouseLaid before the House
2015-02-19HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2015-02-16HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2015-02-12HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2015-01-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback