TX HR116 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Earl "Doc" Osborne on his retirement as athletic trainer for the Angleton Independent School District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Earl "Doc" Osborne on his retirement as athletic trainer for the Angleton Independent School District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-26HouseReported enrolled
2013-06-25HouseAdopted
2013-06-25HouseRules suspended
2013-06-20HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2013-06-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback