TX HR1136 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Friendswood High School cheer squads for their success in competition during the 2012-2013 school year.
Title
Honoring the Friendswood High School cheer squads for their success in competition during the 2012-2013 school year.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-10 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-26 | House | Filed |