TX HR1112 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Katie N. Reed on her retirement from the Northside ISD school board.
Title
Congratulating Katie N. Reed on her retirement from the Northside ISD school board.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |