TX HR1083 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending John Hibbs for his service on the Arlington ISD Board of Trustees.
Title
Commending John Hibbs for his service on the Arlington ISD Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed |