TX HR108 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Bob Nance of Victoria for his career as a radio broadcaster.
Title
Honoring Bob Nance of Victoria for his career as a radio broadcaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-18 | House | Filed |