TX HR1071 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jordan Robinson on her appointment as president and CEO of the Round Rock Chamber.
Title
Congratulating Jordan Robinson on her appointment as president and CEO of the Round Rock Chamber.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Filed |