TX HR1068 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Sneha and Pranai Reddy of Corpus Christi for their work as founders of Walk Again.
Title
Honoring Sneha and Pranai Reddy of Corpus Christi for their work as founders of Walk Again.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed |