TX HR104 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Memphis High School Lady Cyclones golf team on winning the 2013 UIL 1A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Memphis High School Lady Cyclones golf team on winning the 2013 UIL 1A state championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-17 | House | Filed |