TX HR1039 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Reverend David E. Wilson, the pastor of Greater Cornerstone Baptist Church in Dallas, for his service as Chaplain of the Day on May 2, 2019.
Title
Honoring the Reverend David E. Wilson, the pastor of Greater Cornerstone Baptist Church in Dallas, for his service as Chaplain of the Day on May 2, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed |