TX HR1002 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 16, 2019, as Education and Sharing Day in honor of Rabbi Menachem Mendel Schneerson.
Title
Recognizing April 16, 2019, as Education and Sharing Day in honor of Rabbi Menachem Mendel Schneerson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-09 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EDUCATION & SHARING DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates