TX HR100 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Julia Alexandra Bass, former journal clerk of the Texas House of Representatives.
Title
In memory of Julia Alexandra Bass, former journal clerk of the Texas House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Ruth McClendon [D] |
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Larry Phillips [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2014-12-11 | House | Filed |