TX HJR91 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to establish for purposes of ad valorem taxation an initial limit on the appraised value of the residence homestead of a disabled or elderly person that was rehabilitated or constructed as a replacement residence under the federal community development block grant program or a housing rehabilitation program of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to establish for purposes of ad valorem taxation an initial limit on the appraised value of the residence homestead of a disabled or elderly person that was rehabilitated or constructed as a replacement residence under the federal community development block grant program or a housing rehabilitation program of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2878 (Enabled by) 2009-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Aging
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Disabled Persons
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Disabled Persons
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions