TX HJR83 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Referred to Finance
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Referred to Finance
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to permit conservation and reclamation districts in Hays and Chambers Counties to issue bonds supported by ad valorem taxes to fund the development and maintenance of parks and recreational facilities.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to permit conservation and reclamation districts in Hays and Chambers Counties to issue bonds supported by ad valorem taxes to fund the development and maintenance of parks and recreational facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Record vote | |
2009-05-11 | Adopted as amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Enabled by) 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
BONDS
County Government
County Government--Finance
HAYS COUNTY
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Soil & Water Conservation
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
County Government
County Government--Finance
HAYS COUNTY
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Soil & Water Conservation
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility