TX HJR61 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the state or a municipality or county to donate certain property to the United States to promote border crossing security or international bridge trade corridors, to issue public securities to finance the acquisition or construction of that property, and to use public money to make certain payments related to public-private partnerships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the state or a municipality or county to donate certain property to the United States to promote border crossing security or international bridge trade corridors, to issue public securities to finance the acquisition or construction of that property, and to use public money to make certain payments related to public-private partnerships.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-17HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-04-17HouseRead first time
2017-01-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback