TX HJR49 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to limit the maximum appraised value of real property for ad valorem tax purposes to 110 percent or more of the appraised value of the property for the preceding tax year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to limit the maximum appraised value of real property for ad valorem tax purposes to 110 percent or more of the appraised value of the property for the preceding tax year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-18 Left pending in committee
2009-03-18 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-03-18 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-18 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-23 Referred to Ways & Means
2009-02-23 Read first time
2009-02-02 Filed

Same As/Similar To

HJR43 (Same As) 2009-02-19 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB979 (Enabled by) 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback