TX HJR4 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the flood infrastructure fund to assist in the financing of drainage, flood mitigation, and flood control projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the flood infrastructure fund to assist in the financing of drainage, flood mitigation, and flood control projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Adopted RV#268 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#268
2019-04-10HouseAdopted
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SJR51 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
HB13 (Enabled by) 2019-04-16 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
HB478 (Enabled by) 2019-03-05 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback