TX HJR39 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State

Summary

Post-ratifying Amendment XXIV to the Constitution of the United States prohibiting the denial or abridgment of the right to vote for failure to pay any poll tax or other tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Post-ratifying Amendment XXIV to the Constitution of the United States prohibiting the denial or abridgment of the right to vote for failure to pay any poll tax or other tax.

Sponsors

Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Jimmie Aycock [R]Rep. Leo Berman [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Valinda Bolton [D]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Daniel Branch [R]Rep. Betty Brown [R]
Rep. Fred Brown [R]Rep. Lon Burnam [D]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. William Callegari [R]
Rep. Barbara Caraway [D]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D]Rep. Norma Chavez [D]Rep. Warren Chisum [R]
Rep. Wayne Christian [R]Rep. Ellen Cohen [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. Frank Corte [R]Rep. Joe Crabb [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Rep. Myra Crownover [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. John Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Joe Driver [R]Rep. Dawnna Dukes [D]Rep. Jim Dunnam [D]
Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Al Edwards [D]Rep. Craig Eiland [D]Rep. Rob Eissler [R]
Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Sen. Rodney Ellis [D]Rep. Kirk England [D]Rep. David Farabee [D]
Rep. Joe Farias [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. Allen Fletcher [R]
Rep. Kino Flores [D]Rep. Stephen Frost [D]Rep. Pete Gallego [D]Rep. Dan Gattis [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Mike Hamilton [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Rep. Rick Hardcastle [R]
Rep. Patricia Harless [R]Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R]Rep. Will Hartnett [R]Rep. Joe Heflin [D]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Harvey Hilderbran [R]Rep. Scott Hochberg [D]
Rep. Terri Hodge [D]Rep. Mark Homer [D]Rep. Charles Hopson [R]Rep. Charlie Howard [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Rep. Carl Isett [R]Rep. Jim Jackson [R]
Rep. Delwin Jones [R]Rep. James Keffer [R]Rep. Carol Kent [D]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Susan King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Tim Kleinschmidt [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Ken Legler [R]Rep. David Leibowitz [D]
Rep. Tryon Lewis [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Jerry Madden [R]Rep. Diana Maldonado [D]
Rep. Marisa Marquez [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Brian McCall [R]Rep. Ruth McClendon [D]
Rep. Jim McReynolds [D]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Rep. Thomas Merritt [R]Rep. Robert Miklos [D]
Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D]
Rep. Dora Olivo [D]Rep. Rob Orr [R]Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D]Rep. John Otto [R]
Rep. Diane Patrick [R]Sen. Kenneth Paxton [R]Rep. Aaron Pena [D]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]
Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Paula Pierson [D]Rep. Jim Pitts [R]Rep. Chente Quintanilla [D]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Debbie Riddle [R]Rep. Allan Ritter [R]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Patrick Rose [D]Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R]Rep. Mark Shelton [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Wayne Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Burt Solomons [R]Rep. Mark Strama [D]
Rep. David Swinford [R]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Rep. Kristi Thibaut [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Yvonne Toureilles [D]Rep. Vicki Truitt [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Sylvester Turner [D]
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D]Rep. Allen Vaught [D]Rep. Marc Veasey [D]Rep. Mike Villarreal [D]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Randy Weber [R]Sen. Royce West [D]
Rep. Beverly Woolley [R]Rep. Tara Ybarra [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-26 Filed with the Secretary of State
2009-05-25 Signed in the Senate
2009-05-23 Signed in the House
2009-05-23 Reported enrolled
2009-05-22 Senate passage reported
2009-05-22 Record vote
2009-05-22 Passed
2009-05-22 Read 3rd time
2009-05-22 Record vote
2009-05-22 Three day rule suspended
2009-05-22 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-22 Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2009-05-22 Rules suspended-Regular order of business
2009-05-22 Co-sponsor authorized
2009-05-21 Placed on intent calendar
2009-05-20 Co-sponsor authorized
2009-05-19 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-19 Reported favorably w/o amendments
2009-05-18 Testimony taken in committee
2009-05-18 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-18 Co-sponsor authorized
2009-05-18 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-05-06 Referred to State Affairs
2009-05-06 Read first time
2009-05-05 Received from the House
2009-05-04 Reported engrossed
2009-05-04 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-04 Record vote
2009-05-04 Adopted
2009-05-04 Read 2nd time
2009-05-04 Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2009-05-02 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-24 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-23 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-22 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-17 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-04-17 Considered in formal meeting
2009-04-15 Left pending in committee
2009-04-15 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-04-15 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-15 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-02 Referred to Elections
2009-03-02 Read first time
2009-01-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SJR27 (Same As) 2009-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback