TX HJR22 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-2)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit the state or a governmental entity in the state from providing support for the performance of an abortion or abortion-related services.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit the state or a governmental entity in the state from providing support for the performance of an abortion or abortion-related services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Abortion
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HJR22 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HJ00022I.htm |