TX HJR20 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for exceptions to the requirement that a home equity loan be closed only at the office of the lender, an attorney at law, or a title company.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for exceptions to the requirement that a home equity loan be closed only at the office of the lender, an attorney at law, or a title company.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Adopted RV#650 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#650 |
2023-04-27 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-02-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB264 (Enabled by) 2023-05-03 - Received from the House
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Financial
Financial--General
HOME EQUITY
LOANS
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Financial
Financial--General
HOME EQUITY
LOANS
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments