TX HJR1 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 4th Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-21 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-21 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment creating the state school safety fund to provide ongoing financial support for projects that ensure the safety of public schools in this state and providing for the transfer of certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment creating the state school safety fund to provide ongoing financial support for projects that ensure the safety of public schools in this state and providing for the transfer of certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-17 - House - Adopted as amended RV#50 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-11-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-11-17 | House | Record vote RV#50 |
2023-11-17 | House | Adopted as amended |
2023-11-17 | House | Amended 1-K. King |
2023-11-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-11-17 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2023-11-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-11-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-11-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-11-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-11-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-11-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to Educational Opportunity & Enrichment, Select |
2023-11-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Enabled by) 2023-11-21 - Referred to Education
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Safety
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Safety