TX HJR1 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide for the transfer of certain general revenue to the economic stabilization fund and to the state highway fund and for the dedication of the revenue transferred to the state highway fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide for the transfer of certain general revenue to the economic stabilization fund and to the state highway fund and for the dedication of the revenue transferred to the state highway fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pickett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-08-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-08-05 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2013-08-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-08-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-08-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-08-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-08-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-08-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-08-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-08-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-07-30 | House | Referred to Transportation Funding, Select |
2013-07-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-07-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Enabled by) 2013-08-07 - Effective on adoption of const. amendment
Subjects
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=833&Bill=HJR1 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/833/billtext/html/HJ00001I.htm |