TX HJR1 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide funding to develop and maintain research universities in this state of the highest tier.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide funding to develop and maintain research universities in this state of the highest tier.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4591 (Enabled by) 2009-05-06 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BONDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments