TX HCR89 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - Received from the House
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - Received from the House
Summary
Commemorating the 60th anniversary of the creation of the Texas Legislative Council.
Title
Commemorating the 60th anniversary of the creation of the Texas Legislative Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | Received from the House | |
2009-03-26 | Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |