TX HCR87 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Declaring March 10, 2009, Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Declaring March 10, 2009, Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Signed in the House | |
2009-03-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-17 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-03-17 | Read & adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Received from the House | |
2009-03-10 | Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Subjects
BRAZORIA COUNTY DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates