TX HCR86 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Bowie knife as the official state knife of Texas.
Title
Designating the Bowie knife as the official state knife of Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] | Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Adopted RV#1033 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1033 |
2019-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-07 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR20 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Subjects
BOWIE KNIFE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--State Symbols
STATE KNIFE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--State Symbols
STATE KNIFE