TX HCR83 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Shamrock St. Patrick's Day Celebration as the official St. Patrick's Day Celebration for the State of Texas.
Title
Designating the Shamrock St. Patrick's Day Celebration as the official St. Patrick's Day Celebration for the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
SHAMROCK ST. PATRICK'S DAY CELEBRATION
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
SHAMROCK ST. PATRICK'S DAY CELEBRATION