TX HCR80 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Frederic M. Newman on his induction into the Petroleum Hall of Fame.
Title
Congratulating Frederic M. Newman on his induction into the Petroleum Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-13 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-09 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-09 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed |