TX HCR79 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 27, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 4, 2019.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 27, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 4, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Adopted RV#40 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Adopted RV#40 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-02-25 | House | Record vote RV#40 |
2019-02-25 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |