TX HCR7 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Administration
Pending: Senate Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Administration
Pending: Senate Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the TWC building the Lloyd M. Bentsen State Office Building.
Title
Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the TWC building the Lloyd M. Bentsen State Office Building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1087 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1087 |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2020-11-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
LLOYD M. BENTSEN STATE OFFICE BUILDING
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
LLOYD M. BENTSEN STATE OFFICE BUILDING
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy