TX HCR67 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating April 6 as Tejano Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.
Title
Designating April 6 as Tejano Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1207 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1207 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1207 |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
TEJANO DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
TEJANO DAY