TX HCR54 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred to Economic Development
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred to Economic Development
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to enact legislation facilitating a technology-based solution that allows consumers to subscribe to Internet services that exclude adult content.
Title
Urging the United States Congress to enact legislation facilitating a technology-based solution that allows consumers to subscribe to Internet services that exclude adult content.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2009-05-21 | Read first time | |
2009-05-20 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-19 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-10 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-10 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |