TX HCR46 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating April as Beach Safety and Rip Current Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating April as Beach Safety and Rip Current Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Adopted RV#942 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateAdopted
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#942
2021-05-11HouseAdopted
2021-05-11HouseLaid before the House
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback