TX HCR3 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-14)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the governor of the State of Texas to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor posthumously to Audie Murphy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the governor of the State of Texas to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor posthumously to Audie Murphy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-19 Signed by the Governor
2013-07-29 Sent to the Governor
2013-07-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-07-29HouseSigned in the House
2013-07-26HouseReported enrolled
2013-07-25HouseSenate passage reported
2013-07-25SenateRecord vote
2013-07-25SenateAdopted
2013-07-25SenateRead
2013-07-25SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-07-25SenateRules suspended
2013-07-19SenateReceived from the House
2013-07-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-07-18HouseRecord vote
2013-07-18HouseAdopted
2013-07-18HouseLaid before the House
2013-07-18HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2013-07-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-07-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-07-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-07-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-07-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-07-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-07-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2013-07-10HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2013-07-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback