TX HCR25 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing support for full funding of the U.S. Army's Future Vertical Lift program, including the Future Long-Range Assault Aircraft and Future Attack Reconnaissance Aircraft.
Title
Expressing support for full funding of the U.S. Army's Future Vertical Lift program, including the Future Long-Range Assault Aircraft and Future Attack Reconnaissance Aircraft.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Jeff Cason [R] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Adopted RV#295 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Adopted RV#295 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#295 |
2021-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR4 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Not again placed on intent calendar