TX HCR233 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Congratulating Elizabeth Radicioni on being named Clear Creek ISD Secondary Teacher of the Year.
Title
Congratulating Elizabeth Radicioni on being named Clear Creek ISD Secondary Teacher of the Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-28 | Read & adopted | |
2009-05-26 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-25 | Adopted | |
2009-05-25 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-18 | Filed |