TX HCR23 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Received from the House
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Received from the House
Summary
Congratulating Ted Collins, Jr., on his receipt of the 2008 Top Hand Award from the Permian Basin Petroleum Association.
Title
Congratulating Ted Collins, Jr., on his receipt of the 2008 Top Hand Award from the Permian Basin Petroleum Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | Received from the House | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-01-28 | Filed |