TX HCR208 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
In memory of Herbert Hugh Campbell of Paris.
Title
In memory of Herbert Hugh Campbell of Paris.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Rep. Mark Homer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-18 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-18 | Read & adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-30 | Filed |