TX HCR185 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 109.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 109.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1909 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1909 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Adopted HB 109 |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1909 |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted HB 109 |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Holidays
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Holidays
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective