TX HCR175 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Received from the House
Status: Introduced on April 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Received from the House
Summary
Recognizing March 25, 2009, as Mount Pleasant Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 25, 2009, as Mount Pleasant Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Homer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-06-01 | Adopted | |
2009-06-01 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-14 | Filed |
Subjects
MOUNT PLEASANT DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates