TX HCR169 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

In memory of Olin "Cliff" Hand of Royse City.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memory of Olin "Cliff" Hand of Royse City.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-14HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-13HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-13SenateRead & adopted
2019-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseAdopted
2019-05-10HouseRules suspended
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-05-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback