TX HCR16 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Linda J. Cowden of Midland on receiving the 2023 Excellence in Governing Board Leadership Award.
Title
Congratulating Linda J. Cowden of Midland on receiving the 2023 Excellence in Governing Board Leadership Award.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-11-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-11-07 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-11-07 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-11-07 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-11-05 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-11-01 | House | Adopted |
2023-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-10-06 | House | Filed |