TX HCR144 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Texas Cattle Feeders Association.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Texas Cattle Feeders Association.
Sponsors
Rep. John Smithee [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-17 | House | Filed |