TX HCR142 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the dedication of the PermiaCare building in honor of William C. "Bill" Morrow of Midland.
Title
Commemorating the dedication of the PermiaCare building in honor of William C. "Bill" Morrow of Midland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-23 | House | Filed |