TX HCR141 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending artist George Skypeck for donating his painting The Spirit of the Alamo Lives On to the State of Texas.
Title
Commending artist George Skypeck for donating his painting The Spirit of the Alamo Lives On to the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-16 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-08 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed |